05/26/2011 | No Action | |||
05/24/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
05/17/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/17/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/17/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/17/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/16/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/10/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/27/2011 | File Number 646 | |||
04/27/2011 | House Calendar Number 376 | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/20/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/28/2011 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |||
02/14/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |