03/21/2011 | File Number 102 | |||
03/21/2011 | House Calendar Number 82 | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/21/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/09/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/03/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
03/02/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
03/01/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Insurance and Real Estate | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |