05/11/2011 | File Number 781 | |||
05/11/2011 | House Calendar Number 475 | |||
05/11/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |