05/17/2011 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
05/17/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/17/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/17/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/17/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
05/05/2011 | File Number 763 | |||
05/05/2011 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/29/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/26/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/13/2011 | File Number 520 | |||
04/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 313 | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/14/2011 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |