11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT CONCERNING BIRTH-TO-THREE SERVICES AND REHABILITATION SERVICES FOR CHRONIC GAMBLERS. |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | Section 1. Section 38a-490a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective January 1, 2012): |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | Each individual health insurance policy providing coverage of the type specified in subdivisions (1), (2), (4), (11) and (12) of section 38a-469 delivered, issued for delivery or renewed in this state on or after July 1, 1996, shall provide coverage for medically necessary early intervention services provided as part of an individualized family service plan pursuant to section 17a-248e. Such policy shall provide [(1)] coverage for such services provided by qualified personnel, as defined in section 17a-248, for a child from birth until the child's third birthday. [, and (2)] No such policy shall impose a coinsurance, copayment, deductible or other out-of-pocket expense for such services, except that a high deductible plan, as that term is used in subsection (f) of section 38a-493, shall not be subject to the deductible limits set forth in this section. Such policy shall provide a maximum benefit of six thousand four hundred dollars per child per year and an aggregate benefit of nineteen thousand two hundred dollars per child over the total three-year period. No payment made under this section shall be applied by the insurer, health care center or plan administrator against any maximum lifetime or annual limits specified in the policy or health benefits plan. |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | Sec. 2. Section 38a-516a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective January 1, 2012): |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | Each group health insurance policy providing coverage of the type specified in subdivisions (1), (2), (4), (11) and (12) of section 38a-469 delivered, issued for delivery or renewed in this state on or after July 1, 1996, shall provide coverage for medically necessary early intervention services provided as part of an individualized family service plan pursuant to section 17a-248e. Such policy shall provide [(1)] coverage for such services provided by qualified personnel, as defined in section 17a-248, for a child from birth until the child's third birthday. [, and (2)] No such policy shall impose a coinsurance, copayment, deductible or other out-of-pocket expense for such services, except that a high deductible plan, as that term is used in subsection (f) of section 38a-493, shall not be subject to the deductible limits set forth in this section. Such policy shall provide a maximum benefit of six thousand four hundred dollars per child per year and an aggregate benefit of nineteen thousand two hundred dollars per child over the total three-year period, except that for a child with autism spectrum disorders, as defined in section 38a-514b, who is receiving early intervention services as defined in section 17a-248, the maximum benefit available through early intervention providers shall be fifty thousand dollars per child per year and an aggregate benefit of one hundred fifty thousand dollars per child over the total three-year period as provided for in section 38a-514b. Nothing in this section shall be construed to increase the amount of coverage required for autism spectrum disorders for any child beyond the amounts set forth in section 38a-514b. Any coverage provided for autism spectrum disorders through an individualized family service plan pursuant to section 17a-248e shall be credited toward the coverage amounts required under section 38a-514b. No payment made under this section shall be applied by the insurer, health care center or plan administrator against any maximum lifetime or annual limits specified in the policy or health benefits plan. |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | Sec. 3. Section 12-818 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2011): |
---|
25 | 25 | | |
---|
26 | 26 | | For each of the fiscal years ending June 30, 2010, and June 30, 2011, the Connecticut Lottery Corporation shall transfer one million nine hundred thousand dollars of the revenue received from the sale of lottery tickets to the chronic gamblers treatment rehabilitation account created pursuant to section 17a-713. For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2012, and each fiscal year thereafter, the Connecticut Lottery Corporation shall transfer one million [five] nine hundred thousand dollars of the revenue received from the sale of lottery tickets to the chronic gamblers treatment rehabilitation account created pursuant to section 17a-713. |
---|
27 | 27 | | |
---|
28 | 28 | | |
---|
29 | 29 | | |
---|
30 | 30 | | |
---|
31 | 31 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: |
---|
32 | 32 | | Section 1 January 1, 2012 38a-490a |
---|
33 | 33 | | Sec. 2 January 1, 2012 38a-516a |
---|
34 | 34 | | Sec. 3 July 1, 2011 12-818 |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: |
---|
37 | 37 | | |
---|
38 | 38 | | Section 1 |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | January 1, 2012 |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | 38a-490a |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | Sec. 2 |
---|
45 | 45 | | |
---|
46 | 46 | | January 1, 2012 |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | 38a-516a |
---|
49 | 49 | | |
---|
50 | 50 | | Sec. 3 |
---|
51 | 51 | | |
---|
52 | 52 | | July 1, 2011 |
---|
53 | 53 | | |
---|
54 | 54 | | 12-818 |
---|
55 | 55 | | |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | |
---|
58 | 58 | | APP Joint Favorable Subst. |
---|