|
07/13/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-202
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
File Number 862
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 574
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6553
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
File Number 246
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
House Calendar Number 157
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/28/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|