04/20/2011 | File Number 593 | |||
04/20/2011 | House Calendar Number 354 | |||
04/20/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/20/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/06/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |