03/22/2011 | Box | |||
03/11/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
03/11/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
03/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Energy and Technology | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |