|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-209
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
File Number 887
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 617
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7970
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7386
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
File Number 538
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
House Calendar Number 323
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|