07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/28/2011 | Public Act 11-211 | |||
06/08/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/19/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 513 | |||
05/19/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/17/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/03/2011 | File Number 709 | |||
05/03/2011 | House Calendar Number 432 | |||
05/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2011 | Public Hearing 04/04 | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |