04/07/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/17/2011 | File Number 70 | |||
03/17/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 94 | |||
03/17/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/17/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/02/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/02/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
01/19/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
01/18/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/11/2011 | Vote to Draft |