Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00023 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 23
2-January Session, 2011 *_____SB00023LAB___030211____*
1+General Assembly Committee Bill No. 23
2+January Session, 2011 LCO No. 766
3+ *00766SB00023LAB*
4+Referred to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
5+Introduced by:
6+(LAB)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 23
10+Committee Bill No. 23
711
812 January Session, 2011
913
10-*_____SB00023LAB___030211____*
14+LCO No. 766
15+
16+*00766SB00023LAB*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(LAB)
1123
1224 AN ACT CONCERNING EMPLOYEES INJURED BETWEEN 1993 AND 2006 AND SOCIAL SECURITY OFFSETS UNDER THE WORKERS' COMPENSATION ACT.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
16-Section 1. (Effective from passage) (a) On or before July 1, 2011, each employer in the state, or the employer's insurer, shall provide an electronic list to the chairman of the Workers' Compensation Commission identifying any employee who made a claim to the Workers' Compensation Commission for an injury that occurred between July 1, 1993, and May 30, 2006, and began receiving compensation for total incapacity pursuant to section 31-307 of the general statutes and (1) had his or her compensation for total incapacity reduced as a result of being eligible to receive old age insurance benefits pursuant to the federal Social Security Act, and (2) is still receiving such compensation. Such list shall also include confirmation from the employer or the employer's insurer that each employee identified pursuant to this subsection has been provided written notice, at such employee's last known address, from the employer or the employer's insurer, that he or she may be entitled to an increase in his or her compensation payment beginning January 1, 2012.
28+Section 1. (Effective from passage) (a) On or before October 1, 2011, the chairman of the Workers' Compensation Commission shall identify any employee who began receiving compensation for total incapacity pursuant to section 31-307 of the general statutes between July 1, 1993, and May 30, 2006, and (1) had his or her compensation for total incapacity reduced as a result of being eligible to receive old age insurance benefits pursuant to the federal Social Security Act, and (2) is still receiving such compensation. Any employee identified by the chairman, and the employee's employer or insurer shall be provided notice that the employee's compensation for total incapacity shall be recalculated and additional compensation may be awarded.
1729
18-(b) On or after October 1, 2011, the chairman of the Workers' Compensation Commission shall mail a written confirmation letter to each employee identified in the list provided by an employer or the employer's insurer that such employee should have received notice that they may be entitled to an increase in his or her compensation beginning January 1, 2012. Any employee who did not receive a notice from his or her employer shall be instructed to call the Workers' Compensation Commission.
30+(b) On or after October 1, 2011, the chairman of the Workers' Compensation Commission shall recalculate the compensation paid to any employee identified pursuant to subsection (a) of this act to determine the employee's compensation without a reduction for old age insurance benefits.
1931
20-(c) On or before January 1, 2012, the chairman of the Workers' Compensation Commission shall order an adjustment of the compensation paid on and after such date to any employee meeting the requirements of subsection (a) of this section and identified in the list provided by an employer or an employer's insurer to the amount of compensation owed the employee without the reduction for old age insurance benefits.
32+(c) On or before January 1, 2012, the chairman, or any Workers' Compensation commissioner, shall order an adjustment of the compensation paid to any employee identified pursuant to subsection (a) of this section to the amount of compensation the employee would receive without the reduction for old age insurance benefits.
2133
2234 (d) No employee identified pursuant to subsection (a) of this section, who is provided additional compensation for total incapacity pursuant to subsection (c) of this section, shall be eligible for additional compensation for any compensation payments received prior to January 2, 2012.
2335
2436
2537
2638
2739 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
2840 Section 1 from passage New section
2941
3042 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3143
3244 Section 1
3345
3446 from passage
3547
3648 New section
3749
50+Statement of Purpose:
51+
52+To award an increase in workers' compensation payments to individuals whose payments were offset as a result of receiving Social Security between 1993 and 2006.
53+
54+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]
3855
3956
40-LAB Joint Favorable Subst.
4157
42-LAB
58+Co-Sponsors: SEN. PRAGUE, 19th Dist.; REP. HOVEY, 112th Dist.
4359
44-Joint Favorable Subst.
60+Co-Sponsors:
61+
62+SEN. PRAGUE, 19th Dist.; REP. HOVEY, 112th Dist.
63+
64+S.B. 23