|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-221
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 583
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7603
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
No New File by Committee on General Law
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
File Number 16
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 41
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/28/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/03
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology
|
|
|
|
01/26/2011
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|