05/02/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
05/02/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/28/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/22/2011 | File Number 124 | |||
03/22/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 126 | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
02/23/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/26/2011 | Vote to Draft |