06/01/2011 | House Calendar Number 573 | |||
06/01/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/31/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/17/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/17/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/17/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/17/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/16/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/12/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/08/2011 | File Number 42 | |||
03/08/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 57 | |||
03/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
02/01/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
01/31/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/26/2011 | Vote to Draft |