06/08/2011 | Senate Recommitted to Aging | |||
05/11/2011 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/05/2011 | File Number 743 | |||
05/05/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 455 | |||
05/05/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/05/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/26/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/17/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
02/17/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
02/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
02/03/2011 | Public Hearing 02/10 | |||
01/27/2011 | Public Hearing 02/01 | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |