Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00366 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 366
2-January Session, 2011 *_____SB00366APP___042611____*
1+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 366
2+January Session, 2011 LCO No. 915
3+ *_____SB00366AGEAPP021511____*
4+Referred to Committee on Aging
5+Introduced by:
6+(AGE)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 366
10+Raised Bill No. 366
711
812 January Session, 2011
913
10-*_____SB00366APP___042611____*
14+LCO No. 915
15+
16+*_____SB00366AGEAPP021511____*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on Aging
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(AGE)
1123
1224 AN ACT CONCERNING FUNDING FOR ADULT DAY CARE CENTERS.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
1628 Section 1. Section 17b-343 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2011):
1729
18-The Commissioner of Social Services shall establish annually the maximum allowable rate to be paid by [said] agencies for homemaker services, chore person services, companion services, respite care, meals on wheels, adult day care services, case management and assessment services, transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster care, except that the maximum allowable rates in effect July 1, 1990, shall remain in effect during the fiscal years ending June 30, 1992, and June 30, 1993. The Commissioner of Social Services shall prescribe uniform forms on which agencies providing such services shall report their costs for such services. Such rates shall be determined on the basis of a reasonable payment for necessary services rendered. The maximum allowable rates established by the Commissioner of Social Services for the Connecticut home-care program for the elderly established under section 17b-342 shall constitute the rates required under this section until revised in accordance with this section. The Commissioner of Social Services shall establish a fee schedule, to be effective on and after July 1, 1994, for homemaker services, chore person services, companion services, respite care, meals on wheels, adult day care services, case management and assessment services, transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster care. The commissioner may annually increase any fee in the fee schedule based on an increase in the cost of services. The commissioner shall increase the fee schedule effective July 1, 2000, by not less than five per cent, for adult day care services. The commissioner shall increase the fee schedule effective July 1, 2011, by four dollars per person, per day for adult day care services. Nothing contained in this section shall authorize a payment by the state to any agency for such services in excess of the amount charged by such agency for such services to the general public.
30+The Commissioner of Social Services shall establish annually the maximum allowable rate to be paid by [said] agencies for homemaker services, chore person services, companion services, respite care, meals on wheels, adult day care services, case management and assessment services, transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster care, except that the maximum allowable rates in effect July 1, 1990, shall remain in effect during the fiscal years ending June 30, 1992, and June 30, 1993. The Commissioner of Social Services shall prescribe uniform forms on which agencies providing such services shall report their costs for such services. Such rates shall be determined on the basis of a reasonable payment for necessary services rendered. The maximum allowable rates established by the Commissioner of Social Services for the Connecticut home-care program for the elderly established under section 17b-342 shall constitute the rates required under this section until revised in accordance with this section. The Commissioner of Social Services shall establish a fee schedule, to be effective on and after July 1, 1994, for homemaker services, chore person services, companion services, respite care, meals on wheels, adult day care services, case management and assessment services, transportation, mental health counseling and elderly foster care. The commissioner may annually increase any fee in the fee schedule based on an increase in the cost of services. The commissioner shall increase the fee schedule effective July 1, 2000, by not less than five per cent, for adult day care services. The commissioner shall increase the fee schedule effective July 1, 2011, to establish a rate of payment of not less than seventy-five dollars per person, per day for adult day care services. Nothing contained in this section shall authorize a payment by the state to any agency for such services in excess of the amount charged by such agency for such services to the general public.
1931
2032
2133
2234
2335 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
2436 Section 1 July 1, 2011 17b-343
2537
2638 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
2739
2840 Section 1
2941
3042 July 1, 2011
3143
3244 17b-343
3345
3446
3547
3648 AGE Joint Favorable C/R APP
37-APP Joint Favorable Subst.
3849
3950 AGE
4051
4152 Joint Favorable C/R
4253
4354 APP
44-
45-APP
46-
47-Joint Favorable Subst.