03/29/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/29/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation | |||
02/09/2011 | Drafted by Committee | |||
01/26/2011 | Vote to Draft |