06/08/2011 | Senate Recommitted to Commerce | |||
05/11/2011 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/08/2011 | File Number 44 | |||
03/08/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 55 | |||
03/08/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/08/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/24/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
01/27/2011 | Public Hearing 02/03 | |||
01/26/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |