LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00842
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00842
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00842
Action History
03/01/2011
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
03/01/2011
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
03/01/2011
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
02/25/2011
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
02/24/2011
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
01/27/2011
Public Hearing 02/03
01/26/2011
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce