06/03/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/25/2011 | Public Act 11-26 | |||
05/18/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
05/18/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/10/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/10/2011 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
05/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/04/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
04/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 400 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
03/21/2011 | File Number 120 | |||
03/21/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 118 | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/04/2011 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |||
02/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |