05/24/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/20/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/18/2011 | Public Act 11-8 | |||
05/11/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
05/11/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 401 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/27/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
03/10/2011 | File Number 51 | |||
03/10/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 65 | |||
03/10/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/04/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/09/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/22/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |||
02/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |