05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/29/2011 | File Number 259 | |||
03/29/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 179 | |||
03/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/16/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/10 | |||
02/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |