|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-87
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/28/2011
|
House Calendar Number 561
|
|
|
|
05/28/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5104
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
File Number 63
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 75
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/01/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|