05/23/2011 | House Calendar Number 536 | |||
05/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/19/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/19/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/19/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6313 | |||
04/21/2011 | No New File by Committee on Transportation | |||
04/21/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/20/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/19/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
04/04/2011 | File Number 333 | |||
04/04/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 217 | |||
03/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |