06/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/07/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/07/2011 | Special Act 11-6 | |||
06/02/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/02/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/12/2011 | House Calendar Number 502 | |||
05/12/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/11/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/13/2011 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
04/13/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
03/31/2011 | File Number 310 | |||
03/31/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 199 | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |