03/30/2011 | File Number 295 | |||
03/30/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 196 | |||
03/30/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/30/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/24/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
03/11/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Safety and Security | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |