Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01081 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 1081
22 January Session, 2011 LCO No. 3637
33 *03637_______ET_*
44 Referred to Committee on Energy and Technology
55 Introduced by:
66 (ET)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 1081
1111
1212 January Session, 2011
1313
1414 LCO No. 3637
1515
1616 *03637_______ET_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on Energy and Technology
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (ET)
2323
2424 AN ACT CONCERNING CLASS III RENEWABLE ENERGY CREDITS.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 16-243q of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2011):
2929
3030 (a) On and after January 1, 2007, each electric distribution company providing standard service pursuant to section 16-244c and each electric supplier as defined in section 16-1 shall demonstrate to the satisfaction of the Department of Public Utility Control that not less than one per cent of the total output of such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2008, not less than two per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On or after January 1, 2009, not less than three per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2010, not less than four per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2011, not less than six per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2012, not less than seven per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2013, not less than eight per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2014, not less than nine per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2015, not less than ten per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2016, not less than eleven per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2017, not less than twelve per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2018, not less than thirteen per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2019, not less than fourteen per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2020, not less than fifteen per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. Electric power obtained from customer-side distributed resources that does not meet air and water quality standards of the Department of Environmental Protection is not eligible for purposes of meeting the percentage standards in this section.
3131
3232 Sec. 2. Subdivision (44) of subsection (a) of section 16-1 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage):
3333
3434 (44) "Class III source" means the electricity output from combined heat and power systems with an operating efficiency level of no less than fifty per cent, determined quarterly on a rolling annual basis, that are part of customer-side distributed resources developed at commercial and industrial facilities in this state on or after January 1, 2006, a waste heat recovery system installed on or after April 1, 2007, that produces electrical or thermal energy by capturing preexisting waste heat or pressure from industrial or commercial processes, or the electricity savings created in this state from conservation and load management programs begun on or after January 1, 2006;
3535
3636
3737
3838
3939 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4040 Section 1 July 1, 2011 16-243q(a)
4141 Sec. 2 from passage 16-1(a)(44)
4242
4343 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4444
4545 Section 1
4646
4747 July 1, 2011
4848
4949 16-243q(a)
5050
5151 Sec. 2
5252
5353 from passage
5454
5555 16-1(a)(44)
5656
5757 Statement of Purpose:
5858
5959 To increase the percentages of the Class III energy portfolio standards and to allow for variances in operating efficiency levels of combined heat and power systems.
6060
6161 [Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]