Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01081 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/23/2011

                            General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 1081
January Session, 2011  LCO No. 3637
 *03637_______ET_*
Referred to Committee on Energy and Technology
Introduced by:
(ET)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 1081 

January Session, 2011

LCO No. 3637

*03637_______ET_*

Referred to Committee on Energy and Technology 

Introduced by:

(ET)

AN ACT CONCERNING CLASS III RENEWABLE ENERGY CREDITS.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. Subsection (a) of section 16-243q of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2011):

(a) On and after January 1, 2007, each electric distribution company providing standard service pursuant to section 16-244c and each electric supplier as defined in section 16-1 shall demonstrate to the satisfaction of the Department of Public Utility Control that not less than one per cent of the total output of such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2008, not less than two per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On or after January 1, 2009, not less than three per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2010, not less than four per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2011, not less than six per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2012, not less than seven per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2013, not less than eight per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2014, not less than nine per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2015, not less than ten per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2016, not less than eleven per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2017, not less than twelve per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2018, not less than thirteen per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2019, not less than fourteen per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. On and after January 1, 2020, not less than fifteen per cent of the total output of any such supplier or such standard service of an electric distribution company shall, on demonstration satisfactory to the Department of Public Utility Control, be obtained from Class III sources. Electric power obtained from customer-side distributed resources that does not meet air and water quality standards of the Department of Environmental Protection is not eligible for purposes of meeting the percentage standards in this section.

Sec. 2. Subdivision (44) of subsection (a) of section 16-1 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective from passage):

(44) "Class III source" means the electricity output from combined heat and power systems with an operating efficiency level of no less than fifty per cent, determined quarterly on a rolling annual basis, that are part of customer-side distributed resources developed at commercial and industrial facilities in this state on or after January 1, 2006, a waste heat recovery system installed on or after April 1, 2007, that produces electrical or thermal energy by capturing preexisting waste heat or pressure from industrial or commercial processes, or the electricity savings created in this state from conservation and load management programs begun on or after January 1, 2006; 

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2011 16-243q(a)
Sec. 2 from passage 16-1(a)(44)

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2011

16-243q(a)

Sec. 2

from passage

16-1(a)(44)

Statement of Purpose: 

To increase the percentages of the Class III energy portfolio standards and to allow for variances in operating efficiency levels of combined heat and power systems. 

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]