04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment | |||
04/14/2011 | File Number 534 | |||
04/14/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 323 | |||
04/14/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/14/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/08/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/30/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/30/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/25/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Health | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |