|
06/06/2011
|
House Calendar Number 633
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8536
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
File Number 312
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 202
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/11
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|