05/09/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 542 | |||
05/09/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/09/2012 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/09/2012 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/09/2012 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5123 | |||
04/12/2012 | File Number 382 | |||
04/12/2012 | House Calendar Number 292 | |||
04/12/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/12/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/27/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/05/2012 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |