04/05/2012 | File Number 288 | |||
04/05/2012 | House Calendar Number 221 | |||
04/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/05/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/20/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/20/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
03/20/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/19/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
03/13/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/16/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |