04/10/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/02/2012 | File Number 220 | |||
04/02/2012 | House Calendar Number 188 | |||
04/02/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/02/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/16/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/01/2012 | Public Hearing 03/05 | |||
02/29/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |