LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB05413
Action History
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB05413
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2012 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB05413
Action History
03/27/2012
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
03/26/2012
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
03/26/2012
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/22/2012
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/21/2012
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations
03/09/2012
Public Hearing 03/16
03/05/2012
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment