06/15/2012 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2012 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/29/2012 | Public Act 12-136 | |||
05/09/2012 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/09/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/13/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 299 | |||
04/13/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/11/2012 | House Passed | |||
04/05/2012 | File Number 298 | |||
04/05/2012 | House Calendar Number 231 | |||
04/05/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/05/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/12/2012 | Public Hearing 03/16 | |||
03/06/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |