04/17/2012 | File Number 486 | |||
04/17/2012 | House Calendar Number 362 | |||
04/17/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/17/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM | |||
04/04/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/03/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/22/2012 | Public Hearing 03/27 | |||
03/07/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |