05/01/2012 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
05/01/2012 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/01/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/01/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/01/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/30/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | |||
04/24/2012 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/19/2012 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/10/2012 | File Number 315 | |||
04/10/2012 | House Calendar Number 256 | |||
04/10/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/02/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/22/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/09/2012 | Public Hearing 03/13 | |||
03/07/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |