04/28/2012 | House Calendar Number 454 | |||
04/28/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/26/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/17/2012 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/17/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/16/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/16/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/11/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/05/2012 | File Number 7 | |||
03/05/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 52 | |||
02/27/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/05/12 10:00 AM | |||
02/10/2012 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |||
02/08/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |