|
06/06/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Public Act 12-75
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/06/2012
|
House Calendar Number 519
|
|
|
|
05/06/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4408
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
File Number 117
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 118
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/17/2012
|
Public Hearing 02/21
|
|
|
|
02/16/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|