LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00078
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00078
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2012 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00078
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 15, 2012
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
May 17, 2012
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 3, 2012
Compare
Bill
April 24, 2012
Compare
Bill
April 18, 2012
Compare
Bill
March 27, 2012
Compare