05/09/2012 | Matter Pass Retained | |||
05/09/2012 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/02/2012 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/25/2012 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/25/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/25/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/19/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on Banks | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks | |||
03/21/2012 | File Number 68 | |||
03/21/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 87 | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/12 5:00 PM | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |