04/27/2012 | House Calendar Number 445 | |||
04/27/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/25/2012 | Senate Passed | |||
04/03/2012 | File Number 235 | |||
04/03/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 193 | |||
04/03/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/03/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/27/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/20/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/20/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/01/2012 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |||
02/17/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |