04/24/2012 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/24/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/24/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/24/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/23/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/17/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/11/2012 | File Number 363 | |||
04/11/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 268 | |||
04/03/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM | |||
03/14/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education | |||
03/14/2012 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education | |||
03/09/2012 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Education | |||
02/29/2012 | Public Hearing 03/07 | |||
02/22/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |