17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | Referred to Committee on Public Health |
---|
19 | 19 | | |
---|
20 | 20 | | Introduced by: |
---|
21 | 21 | | |
---|
22 | 22 | | (PH) |
---|
23 | 23 | | |
---|
24 | 24 | | AN ACT CONCERNING NOTICE TO PARENTS OF STUDENT ATHLETES ABOUT CONCUSSIONS AND HEAD INJURIES. |
---|
25 | 25 | | |
---|
26 | 26 | | Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened: |
---|
27 | 27 | | |
---|
28 | 28 | | Section 1. Section 10-149b of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective October 1, 2012): |
---|
29 | 29 | | |
---|
30 | 30 | | (a) (1) For the school year commencing July 1, 2010, and each school year thereafter, any person who holds or is issued a coaching permit by the State Board of Education and is a coach of intramural or interscholastic athletics shall complete an initial training course regarding concussions and head injuries, developed or approved pursuant to subdivision (1) of subsection (b) of this section, prior to commencing the coaching assignment for the season of such school athletics. |
---|
31 | 31 | | |
---|
32 | 32 | | (2) For the school year commencing July 1, 2011, and each school year thereafter, and after completion of the initial training course described in subdivision (1) of this subsection, such coach shall annually review current and relevant information regarding concussions and head injuries, prepared or approved pursuant to subdivision (2) of subsection (b) of this section, prior to commencing the coaching assignment for the season of such school athletics. Such annual review shall not be required in any year when such coach is required to complete the refresher course, pursuant to subdivision (3) of this subsection, for reissuance of his or her coaching permit. |
---|
33 | 33 | | |
---|
34 | 34 | | (3) For the school year commencing July 1, 2015, and each school year thereafter, a coach shall complete a refresher course, developed or approved pursuant to subdivision (3) of subsection (b) of this section, not later than five years after completion of the initial training course, as a condition of the reissuance of a coaching permit to such coach. Such coach shall thereafter retake such refresher course at least once every five years as a condition of the reissuance of a coaching permit to such coach. |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | (b) (1) On or before July 1, 2010, the State Board of Education, in consultation with (A) the governing authority for intramural and interscholastic athletics, (B) an appropriate organization representing licensed athletic trainers, and (C) an organization representing county medical associations, shall develop or approve a training course regarding concussions and head injuries. Such training course shall include, but not be limited to, (i) the recognition of the symptoms of a concussion or head injury, (ii) the means of obtaining proper medical treatment for a person suspected of having a concussion or head injury, and (iii) the nature and risk of concussions and head injuries, including the danger of continuing to play after sustaining a concussion or head injury and the proper method of allowing a student athlete who has sustained a concussion or head injury to return to athletic activity. |
---|
37 | 37 | | |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) On or before July 1, 2011, and annually thereafter, the State Board of Education, in consultation with the organizations described in subdivision (1) of this subsection, shall prepare or approve annual review materials regarding current and relevant information about concussions and head injuries. |
---|
39 | 39 | | |
---|
40 | 40 | | (3) On or before January 1, 2014, the State Board of Education, in consultation with the organizations described in subdivision (1) of this subsection, shall develop or approve a refresher course regarding concussions and head injuries. Such refresher course shall include, but not be limited to, (A) an overview of key recognition and safety practices, (B) an update on medical developments in the field of concussion research and prevention, and (C) an update on new relevant federal, state and local laws and regulations. |
---|
41 | 41 | | |
---|
42 | 42 | | (c) (1) On or before January 1, 2013, the State Board of Education, in consultation with the Commissioner of Public Health, shall develop and approve a written statement to inform the parents and legal guardians of student athletes involved in intramural or interscholastic athletic activities regarding concussions and head injuries. |
---|
43 | 43 | | |
---|
44 | 44 | | (2) For the school year commencing July 1, 2013, and each school year thereafter, any person who holds or is issued a coaching permit by the State Board of Education and is a coach of intramural or interscholastic athletics shall, before beginning the athletic activity for the school year, provide the parent or legal guardian of each participating student athlete with a copy of the written statement described in subdivision (1) of this subsection and obtain the parent or legal guardian's signature attesting to the fact that the parent or legal guardian has received a copy of such statement and authorizes the student athlete to participate in the athletic activity. |
---|
45 | 45 | | |
---|
46 | 46 | | [(c)] (d) The State Board of Education may revoke the coaching permit, in accordance with the provisions of subsection (j) of section 10-145b, of any coach found to be in violation of this section. |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | |
---|
49 | 49 | | |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: |
---|
52 | 52 | | Section 1 October 1, 2012 10-149b |
---|
53 | 53 | | |
---|
54 | 54 | | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections: |
---|
55 | 55 | | |
---|
56 | 56 | | Section 1 |
---|
57 | 57 | | |
---|
58 | 58 | | October 1, 2012 |
---|
59 | 59 | | |
---|
60 | 60 | | 10-149b |
---|
61 | 61 | | |
---|
62 | 62 | | |
---|
63 | 63 | | |
---|
64 | 64 | | PH Joint Favorable C/R ED |
---|
65 | 65 | | ED Joint Favorable |
---|