05/07/2012 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
05/07/2012 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/07/2012 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/07/2012 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/07/2012 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/24/2012 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/19/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/18/2012 | No New File by Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
04/10/2012 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology | |||
04/02/2012 | File Number 199 | |||
04/02/2012 | Senate Calendar Number 176 | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM | |||
03/15/2012 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/24/2012 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2012 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |