|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Public Act 12-52
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
House Calendar Number 327
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3180
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
File Number 264
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 212
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
03/14/2012
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|