|
05/09/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4667
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Calendar Number 503
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 4667
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4550
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
File Number 423
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 314
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
|
02/29/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|