|
05/07/2012
|
House Calendar Number 537
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5316
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
File Number 601
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/01/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
No New File by Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
File Number 201
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 188
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/12 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
|
03/02/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|