|
05/31/2012
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Public Act 12-54
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
House Calendar Number 427
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3380
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
File Number 372
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Senate Calendar Number 271
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/12 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Public Hearing 03/16
|
|
|
|
03/05/2012
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|